GA HB324 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance, expiration, and renewal of licenses, so as to require the term "noncitizen" to be included on certain licenses, permits, and identification cards; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; term noncitizen be included on certain licenses, permits, and identification cards; require
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] |
Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House Hopper |