GA HB258 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the office of treasurer of Decatur County; to provide for the transfer of duties; to repeal an Act to provide compensation for the treasurer of Decatur County, approved August 16, 1915 (Ga. L. 1915, p. 209), as amended; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Decatur County; office of treasurer; abolish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #38 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #31 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #31 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-31 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 131 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Hopper |