GA HB257 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to change certain definitions regarding such taxes; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; change certain definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #876 (Y: 146 N: 20 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #691 (Y: 104 N: 64 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #691 (Y: 104 N: 64 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Hopper |