GA HB256 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the emergency telephone number 9-1-1 system, so as to provide for the comprehensive regulation of 9-1-1 charges on prepaid wireless services; to provide for imposition, collection, and distribution of such charges; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for powers, duties, and authority of counties, municipalities, and the state revenue commissioner; to repeal certain provisions relating to prepaid wireless service; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
9-1-1 system; regulation of charges on prepaid wireless services; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Lynne Riley [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Rep. Tom Taylor [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #326 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #159 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #159 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 96 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-16 | House First Readers |