GA HB25 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-519 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to HOPE scholarships and grants, so as to provide that spouses and dependent children of military service members and veterans are eligible as Zell Miller Grant Scholars; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
HOPE; Zell Miller Grant Scholars; provide that spouses and dependent children of military service members and veterans are eligible
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Valerie Clark [R] |
Rep. John Yates [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2014-12-09 | House | House Prefiled |