GA HB239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts, so as to establish the Georgia Business Court pursuant to the Constitution of this state; to provide for law assistants and other employees; to amend Code Section 45-7-4 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding salaries and fees, so as to designate a salary for the judge of the Georgia Business Court; to amend Title 5 of the O.C.G.A., relating to appeal and error, so as to make conforming changes regarding appeals; to amend Chapter 4 of Title 9, Title 23, and Code Section 33-39-21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to declaratory judgments, equity, and equitable relief relative to insurance, respectively, so as to make conforming changes regarding equity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Business Court; establish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #406 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #412 (Y: 120 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #427 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #129 (Y: 156 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-04-02SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback