GA HB232 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-21-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employee and other contributions in the Regents Retirement Plan, so as to change the level of employee participation; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Regents Retirement Plan; level of employee participation; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #288 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Vote #72 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Vote #72 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 258 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hopper |