GA HB23 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to change certain provisions relating to suspension or revocation of the licenses of habitually negligent or dangerous drivers and the point system; to change certain provisions relating to drivers' exercise of due care; to prohibit use of cell phones by persons under 18 years of age while operating a motor vehicle; to prohibit the practice of text messaging by persons under 18 years of age while operating a motor vehicle; to provide penalties for violations; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; cell phones; text messaging; prohibit use
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Rep. Melvin Everson [R] | Rep. Kevin Levitas [D] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Mark Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #811 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #259 - Pass (Y: 138 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #259 - Pass (Y: 138 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 676 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-15 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-14 | House First Readers | |
2008-11-20 | House Prefiled |