GA HB224 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles, so as to provide for the registration of off-road recreation vehicles under certain circumstances; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for a civil penalty; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle registration; off-road recreation vehicles; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-15 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-10 | House First Readers |