GA HB208 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to holidays and observances, so as to provide that the second Wednesday of February of each year shall be designated as "National Swearing-in Day" in Georgia; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State holidays; second Wednesday of February of each year as National Swearing-in Day in Georgia; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Chris Erwin [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] |
Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am: House Vote #382 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #217 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #38 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #217 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #38 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 142 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House Hopper |