GA HB199 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-13-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Schedule I controlled substances, so as to provide for additional controlled substances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; additional Schedule I substances; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #223 - Passage As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #120 - Passage (Y: 150 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #120 - Passage (Y: 150 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rule 7-1.6(b) | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-09 | House First Readers |