GA HB197 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to provide for taxation of land subject to a forest land conservation use covenant; to provide for a performance review board to be appointed by the revenue commissioner; to change certain criteria relating to current use of conservation use property; to provide for penalties for violations; to provide for valuation of property while an appeal of the assessment is in process; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; land subject to a forest land conservation use covenant; provide taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #393 (Y: 175 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #224 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #232 (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #240 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #224 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #232 (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #240 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 204 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-04 | House | House Hopper |