GA HB192 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 39A of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to real estate appraisers, so as to change certain provisions relating to real estate management companies; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide requirements for the establishment and maintenance of a real estate appraisal management company; to authorize the Georgia Real Estate Appraisers Board to establish certain rules and regulations for appraisal management companies and to collect and remit certain fees; to authorize the board to take disciplinary action against appraisal management companies; to revise certain requirements relating to the board's authority to investigate certain violations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and businesses; real estate management companies; change certain provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #199 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Vote #42 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback