GA HB167 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for changes in the definitions of the terms "group accident and sickness insurance" and "true association"; to provide a short title; to provide certain definitions; to include plan administrators in prompt pay requirements; to provide for penalties; to provide an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance Delivery Enhancement Act of 2011; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Steve Davis [R] | Rep. Bill Hembree [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] |
Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #321 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 158 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #320 - Passage As Amended (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #167 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #320 - Passage As Amended (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #167 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 196 | |
2011-05-12 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-03 | House First Readers |