GA HB1461 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from all Jackson County ad valorem taxes for $10,000.00 of the value of the homestead for certain residents of that county who have annual earned family incomes not exceeding $18,000.00 and who are 65 years of age or over, approved March 29, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4381), so as to provide for two classes of residents, to increase the exemption for each class, and to remove an income limitation; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jackson County; ad valorem tax; homestead exemption; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #688 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #687 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #687 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-07 | House | House Hopper |