GA HB1441 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 38 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to operators of private detective businesses and private security businesses, so as to exempt a certified peace officer employed by a licensed private detective business or private security business as an independent contractor from requirements of such chapter; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; exempt a certified peace officer employed as an independent contractor from certain requirements
Sponsors
Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #824 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #671 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #671 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 651 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Hopper |