GA HB1337 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective Date 2024-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective Date 2024-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Mableton to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mableton, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Cummings [D] | Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Rep. Lisa Campbell [D] | Rep. Solomon Adesanya [D] |
Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #880 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #537 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #537 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective Date 2024-05-01 | |
2024-05-01 | Act 541 | |
2024-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |