GA HB131 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to conservation and natural resources, so as to exempt state agencies from certain civil penalties regarding control of water pollution; to exempt certain state agencies from stream buffer requirements; to exempt certain agencies from land-disturbing activities buffer requirements; to repeal the requirements regarding the preparation of an erosion and sediment control plan; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Conservation and natural resources; certain civil penalties; exempt state agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Baker [D] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. David Lucas [D] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-02 | House First Readers |