GA HB126 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to horns, exhaust systems, mirrors, windshields, tires, safety belts, and energy absorption systems of motor vehicles, so as to allow for the use of global positioning or navigation system mounts on the windshields of motor vehicles under certain circumstances; to provide for an exception; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; use of global positioning or navigation system mounts on windshields under certain circumstances; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |