GA HB1256 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Cobb County, approved June 19, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, Ex. Sess., p. 2075), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 10, 2014 (Ga. L. 2014, p. 3893), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Board of Commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Erick Allen [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] |
Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61866 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/205564 |