GA HB1193 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to require the operation of flashing or revolving amber lights upon certain vehicles; to provide for penalties; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; require operation of flashing or revolving amber lights upon certain vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Soo Hong [R] |
Rep. J Collins [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #720 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #513 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #513 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Hopper |