GA HB1146 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 34 and 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to labor and industrial relations and social services, respectively, so as to create the Georgia Vocational Rehabilitation Services Board; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 30 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Industries for the Blind, so as to transfer the direction and supervision of such industries to the Georgia Vocational Rehabilitation Agency; to provide for property and reserve funds of such industries; to provide for compensation of workers in such industries; to specifically reserve certain laws and amend various other provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to conform related cross-references; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Vocational Rehabilitation Services Board; create
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 - Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #563 - Passage (Y: 140 N: 16 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #563 - Passage (Y: 140 N: 16 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-19 | Act 608 | |
2012-04-19 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House First Readers |