GA HB1127 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act changing the compensation of the clerk of the superior court, the sheriff, and the judge of the Probate Court of Cobb County from the fee system to the salary system, approved February 9, 1949 (Ga. L. 1949, p. 427), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3732), so as to change the compensation of the judge of the probate court; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County Probate Court; change compensation of judge
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #646 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 451 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House Hopper |