GA HB112 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to torts to provide certain immunities from liability claims regarding COVID-19, approved August 5, 2020, (Ga L. 2020, p. 798), so as to extend applicability for one year; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Torts; provide certain immunities from liability claims regarding COVID-19; extend applicability for one year
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. John LaHood [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #221 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 46th: Senate Vote #220 (Y: 13 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 6th: Senate Vote #219 (Y: 19 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #27 (Y: 99 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 46th: Senate Vote #220 (Y: 13 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 6th: Senate Vote #219 (Y: 19 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #27 (Y: 99 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 175 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hopper |