GA HB1117 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Downtown Athens Development Authority, approved March 23, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 3533), as amended, which authority was created pursuant to an amendment to the Constitution as contained in Ga. L. 1975, p. 1698, and amended by Ga. L. 1976, p. 1912; to define and create the Downtown Athens Area; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Downtown Athens Development Authority; Downtown Athens Area; define and create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #729 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48935 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/159507 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48935#14275 |