GA HB1116 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to create a board of county commissioners for the county of Jackson," approved December 18, 1901 (Ga. L. 1901, p. 257), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 16, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 3570) and an Act approved May 18, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4030), so as to add a fifth district commissioner to said board; to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the election of the chairperson and members of the board of county commissioners; to revise majority vote and quorum provisions; to revise purchasing provisions; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for effective dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jackson County; Board of Commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #485 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #486 (Y: 148 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #486 (Y: 148 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 539 | |
2022-03-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |