GA HB1046 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 8 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to petroleum products, so as to provide for assistance to individuals with disabilities at self-service gasoline stations; to provide for requirements for assistance; to provide for signage on gasoline pumps with information relating to the assistance; to provide for violations and fines; to provide for enforcement; to provide for limited liability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commerce and trade; provide for assistance to individuals with disabilities at self-service gasoline stations
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Howard [D] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #612 (Y: 142 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House Hopper |