GA HB1041 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 14 of Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to particular matters of proof, so as to provide authority for the use of other mortality tables; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; particular matters of proof; provide authority for the use of other mortality tables
Sponsors
Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Dustin Hightower [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] |
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Taylor Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48507 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/157728 |