GA HB1039 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-40.34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax credit for Class III railroads and reporting, so as to extend the income tax credit for expenditures on the maintenance of railroad track owned or leased by Class III railroads; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; expenditures on maintenance for Class III railroads; extend tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #839 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1421, Hb 1291, Hb 1437, Hb 428, Hb 923, Hb 1039, Hb 1058, Hb 1280, Hr 594, Hr 732, Hr 842: Senate Vote #776 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #626 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1421, Hb 1291, Hb 1437, Hb 428, Hb 923, Hb 1039, Hb 1058, Hb 1280, Hr 594, Hr 732, Hr 842: Senate Vote #776 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #626 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |