GA HB1026 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
Pending: Senate Education and Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
Pending: Senate Education and Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-499 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to selection of REACH scholars, so as to revise the number of REACH scholars to be designated by participating school systems; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; number of REACH scholars to be designated by participating school systems; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #572 (Y: 109 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57750 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190971 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57750#17619 |