GA HB1020 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 56th, 23rd, 7th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to drivers' licenses, so as to provide for license suspension for conviction of drug related offenses; to provide for conditions for reinstatement for such suspended licenses; to reduce the number of required hours in the intervention component of DUI Alcohol or Drug Use Risk Reduction Programs; to require submission of a business plan for operation of such programs; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; license suspension for conviction of drug related offenses; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #784 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #602 (Y: 153 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 56th, 23rd, 7th
2020-06-26HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 67th, 32nd, 17th
2020-06-26HouseHouse Insisted
2020-06-26SenateSenate Insisted
2020-06-26HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-26SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-26SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-06-24SenateSenate Tabled
2020-06-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-17SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback