GA HB1018 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate honoring Support Our Troops, Inc.; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Support Our Troops, Inc.; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Dave Belton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57736 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190929 |