FL S7072 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the purpose of the Casey DeSantis Cancer Research Program; revising duties of the Department of Health under the program; creating the Cancer Connect Collaborative, a council, within the department for a specified purpose; requiring the collaborative to advise the department on the awarding of grants issued through the Cancer Innovation Fund; requiring the collaborative to review grant applications and make recommendations to the department for awarding grants upon the appropriation of funds to the fund, etc.
Title
Cancer Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#890 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (517038) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
S7078 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
H7087 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
S1582 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
H7087 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
S1582 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |