FL H7087 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises purpose of Casey DeSantis Cancer Research Program; revises duties of DOH under program; creates Cancer Connect Collaborative within DOH for specified purpose; requires collaborative to administer Cancer Innovation Fund; requires collaborative to review grant applications & make recommendations to DOH for awarding grants upon appropriation of funds to fund.
Title
Cancer Funding
Sponsors
House Health & Human Services Committee | Rep. David Borrero [R] | Rep. Adam Botana [R] | Rep. Linda Chaney [R] |
Rep. Rick Roth [R] | Rep. Dana Trabulsy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7072 (Same As) 2024-06-19 - Chapter No. 2024-247
S7078 (Similar To) 2024-06-19 - Chapter No. 2024-248
S7078 (Similar To) 2024-06-19 - Chapter No. 2024-248