FL S7068 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter No. 2019-43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Multi-use Corridors of Regional Economic Significance Program within the Department of Transportation; specifying that projects undertaken in the corridors are tolled facilities and certain approved turnpike projects, and are considered as Strategic Intermodal System facilities; requiring the department to identify certain opportunities to accommodate or colocate multiple types of infrastructure-addressing issues during the project development phase, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#322 (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#307 (Y: 42 N: 69 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#306 (Y: 44 N: 70 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Chapter No. 2019-43
2019-05-17 Approved by Governor
2019-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 76 NAYS 36 1107
2019-05-01HouseAmendment(s) failed (855601) 1106
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseAmendment(s) failed (034601, 423865, 578909, 629507, 733719, 822567, 923653) 1037
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time 1033
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-24HouseIn Messages
2019-04-24SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (532226)
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) adopted (372746, 391488, 969912) 409, 410
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-17SenateRetained on Calendar
2019-04-16SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-15SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-11SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-21SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/19/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-28SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

H7113 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3371101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3391373Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/526408/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/889778/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/552392/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/969912/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/512234/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/391488/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/979880/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/372746/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Amendment/602144/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Vote/SenateVote_s07068e1015.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Vote/HouseVote_s07068e2306.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Vote/HouseVote_s07068e2307.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7068/Vote/HouseVote_s07068e2322.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback