FL H7113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Multi-use Corridors of Regional Economic Significance Program within DOT; requires appointment of task force for each corridor; provides membership & duties of task forces & duties of DOT; provides project funding eligibility requirements; authorizes sources of funding; authorizes DOT to accept certain donations of land; provides specified dates for construction of projects & opening of corridors; provides for specified transfers from State Transportation Trust Fund to General Revenue Fund; requires DOT to provide road & bridge construction workforce development program; removes requirement that specified fees from annual license taxes be deposited into General Revenue Fund; provides for disposition & use of funds resulting therefrom; requires reports to Governor & Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLaid on Table
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced
2019-04-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7068 (Similar To) 2019-05-17 - Chapter No. 2019-43

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3391373Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback