FL S7042 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1331
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1331
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a company on the forced labor vendor list from taking certain procurement actions; requiring a company to provide a certain notification to the Department of Management Services within a certain timeframe; requiring the department to create and maintain a forced labor vendor list; providing a process for the department to place a company on such list, etc.
Title
Commodities Produced by Forced Labor
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1331 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1331 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-15 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H1331 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Chapter No. 2024-185