FL S7038 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the employer contribution rates for the retiree health insurance subsidy; revising the required employer retirement contribution rates for members of each membership class and subclass of the Florida Retirement System, etc.
Title
Employer Contributions to Fund Retiree Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#59 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in returning Messages |
2015-04-02 | Senate | In returning messages |
2015-04-02 | House | Immediately certified |
2015-04-02 | House | Refused to concur, acceded to request for conference committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (418077) |
2015-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-02 | House | Received |
2015-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H5005 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |