FL S7020 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7001 (Ch. 2019-26)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions relating to an exemption from public meeting requirements for specified meetings of a university direct-support organization at which proposals seeking research funding or research plans are discussed; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/University Direct-support Organization/Research Funding or Research Plans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7001 (Ch. 2019-26)
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted HB 7001
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-03SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2019-02-19SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/19/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-06SenateFiled
2019-02-05SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/05/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-01-28SenateSubmitted for consideration by Education

Same As/Similar To

H7001 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-26

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100428Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback