FL H7001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of exemption relating to exemption from public meeting requirements for portions of certain state university DSO meetings at which proposal seeking research funding or plan for initiating or supporting research is discussed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/State University DSO Research Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#88 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Chapter No. 2019-26
2019-05-14 Approved by Governor
2019-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-30HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for SB 7020
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-21HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-14HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Education Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7020 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7001 (Ch. 2019-26)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100428Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback