FL S2696 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendments to the State Constitution, relating to the judiciary, to provide a general revision of provisions relating to state courts; courts administration, practices, and procedures; organization and jurisdiction of the Supreme Court, district courts of appeal, and circuit courts; eligibility criteria for judges; organization and jurisdiction of the Judicial Qualification Commission; funding of the state courts system, etc

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judiciary [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Judiciary
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00228
2010-03-09 Referred to Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00228
2010-02-27 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0737 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
S2656 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00502New CodeSee Bill Text
00503New CodeSee Bill Text
00504New CodeSee Bill Text
00505New CodeSee Bill Text
00508New CodeSee Bill Text
00512New CodeSee Bill Text
00514New CodeSee Bill Text
00515New CodeSee Bill Text
00517New CodeSee Bill Text
00520New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback