NY S03529 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts certain substances from being used in menstrual products.
Title
Restricts certain substances from being used in menstrual products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-01-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.98 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1257 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3529A |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A05990 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - advanced to third reading cal.228