FL H0737 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Fiscal Stability Trust Fund within state courts system to be administered by Supreme Court; provides for fund revenues; provides for administration of trust fund & use of moneys in fund; requires balances to remain in trust fund at end of fiscal year; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Stability Trust Fund/State Courts System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00068
2010-02-05 Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development
2010-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0735 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
S2636 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2696 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2656 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00253825Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback