FL S2692 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of total fault for parties and nonparties by judgment in negligence cases. Abrogates use of privilege and immunity defenses as to all statutory causes of action, abuse of process, malicious prosecution, and fraud upon the court. Prohibits sheriffs, clerks of court, full-time deputy sheriffs, and deputy clerks of court from practicing law. Repeals provisions relating to sanctions in criminal appeal cases, etc.
Title
Litigation [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Siplin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00228 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00228 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1714 (Similar To) 2010-04-16 - Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00635; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00635
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0046 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0046 | 071 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0046 | 081 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0057 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0059 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0059 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0454 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0454 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0768 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0924 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0924 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0924 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0939 | 055 | New Code | See Bill Text |