FL S1714 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00635; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00635; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from taking a child alleged to be dependant into custody except in cases involving an immediate threat to the health or safety of the child. Provides requirements for court opinions relating to claims of harmless error. Prohibits certain acts relating to obstruction of justice and deprivation of rights under color of law during court proceedings. Prohibits the use of restraints on a child. Provides exceptions, etc.
Title
Litigation [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00635; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00635 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00118 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0242 (Similar To) 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00268
S1550 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
S2334 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S2588 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
S2692 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S1550 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
S2334 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S2588 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
S2692 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0039 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0046 | 061 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0046 | 071 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0046 | 081 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0057 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0059 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0059 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0454 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0454 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0768 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0839 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0843 | 0855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0924 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0924 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0924 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0939 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 483 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 602 | New Code | See Bill Text |