FL S2614 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a sponsoring agency to notify the local government when a request to locate a home with six or fewer residents which otherwise meets the definition of a community residential home has been submitted. Requires the agency to provide additional information in the notification.
Title
Community Residential Homes [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Community Affairs | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00222 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Community Affairs; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00222 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0577 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC)