FL S2512 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the executive aircraft pool within the Department of Management Services; requiring state officials who request use of or travel in pool aircraft to ensure that such use or travel complies with specified provisions; providing that the use of such aircraft is on a first-call, first-served basis, except in the event of a scheduling conflict the priority order applies; defining the term "foreign country of concern", etc.
Title
Aircraft
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#888 (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#546 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#546 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-06-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 95, NAYS 11 |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Amendment 168820 adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2022-03-14 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-14 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 32 NAYS 1 848 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (168820) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference Committee appointed |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill placed in Conference (State Administration & Technology Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Stargel (Chair), Bean (At Large), Book (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Passidomo (At Large), Perry (At Large), Powell (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stewart (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/State Administration and Technology: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Perry (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Gainer, Pizzo, Rodriguez, Torres, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Diaz, Farmer, Harrell, Jones, Rodrigues, Rodriguez, Rouson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Gainer (Chair), Ausley, Boyd, Cruz, Garcia, Gibson, Hooper, Mayfield, Perry, Taddeo, Wright; |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference |
2022-02-22 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment 006271 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-17 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 30 NAYS 9 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-156
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
287 | 1611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |