FL S2508 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a limitation on remuneration from appropriated state funds for Florida College System institution presidents; redefining the term "public funds"; prohibiting the issuance of general salary increases without regard to employee performance when using appropriated state funds, etc.
Title
Employee Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Stargel (Chair), Bean (At Large), Book (At Large), Farmer (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Passidomo (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture & Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Powell, Rodrigues, Stewart, Thurston; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/State Administration & Technology: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Powell, Rodrigues, Stewart, Thurston; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Perry (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Brandes, Gainer, Pizzo, Rodriguez, Torres; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Polsky, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Polsky, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Diaz, Farmer, Harrell, Jones, Rodrigues, Rodriguez, Rouson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Infrastructure & Tourism: Gainer (Chair), Ausley, Boyd, Cruz, Garcia, Gibson, Hooper, Mayfield, Perry, Taddeo, Wright; |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2021-04-16 | House | Conference Committee appointed |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Higher Education Conference Committee) |
2021-04-08 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | In returning messages |
2021-04-08 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment 377463 adopted |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 377463 filed |
2021-04-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/01/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/31/21, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
H5601 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-46; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 52 (Ch. 2021-160), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2021-43), HB 5101 (Ch. 2021-44), HB 5301 (Ch. 2021-45), HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37), SB 2504 (Ch. 2021-38), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2516 (Ch. 2021-40), SB 2518 (Ch. 2021-41), SB 7018 (Ch. 2021-42)
H5601 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-46; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 52 (Ch. 2021-160), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2021-43), HB 5101 (Ch. 2021-44), HB 5301 (Ch. 2021-45), HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37), SB 2504 (Ch. 2021-38), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2516 (Ch. 2021-40), SB 2518 (Ch. 2021-41), SB 7018 (Ch. 2021-42)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 885 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 886 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 976 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |