FL S2470 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-212
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-212
Summary
Creates the Northeast Florida Regional Transportation Study Commission. Provides for the Jacksonville Transportation Authority to staff the commission. Provides for funding of the commission. Provides for the commission to make available to the public its meeting minutes, reports, and recommendations and publish its reports and recommendations electronically, etc.
Title
Regional Transportation [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter No. 2010-212 | |
2010-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01190; Substituted for CS/HB 1297 -HJ 01190; Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 01190 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01170 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -HJ 01113; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01113 | |
2010-04-23 | In Messages | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00726; Passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 -SJ 00727 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679; Amendment(s) adopted (512672) -SJ 00679; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00679 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 309-C | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524; Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-25 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00344 | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00344 | |
2010-03-19 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00212 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00212 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1297 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Substituted SB 2470; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2470 (Ch. 2010-212) -HJ 01190
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=2470&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |