FL S2450 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; Substituted HB 1279 -SJ 00781; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1279 (Ch. 2010-66) -SJ 00781
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; Substituted HB 1279 -SJ 00781; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1279 (Ch. 2010-66) -SJ 00781
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an exception from the assessment of back taxes on property that was not assessed by a property appraiser.
Title
Property Tax [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; Substituted HB 1279 -SJ 00781; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1279 (Ch. 2010-66) -SJ 00781 | |
2010-04-21 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703 | |
2010-04-20 | CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00703; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00713 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Original reference(s) removed: Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00616; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/20/10, 2:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-04-14 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00614 | |
2010-04-09 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00210 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00210 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1279 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-66
S2040 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
H7215 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 927 (Ch. 2010-109)
S2040 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
H7215 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 927 (Ch. 2010-109)